Politician Profile Page
Public Enterprises
Eskom Inquiry: Ben Ngubane
7 Mar 2018
The Committee heard evidence from Former Eskom Board Chairperson Dr Baldwin Sipho “Ben” Ngubane.
The Committee questioned Dr Ngubane on the pre-purchase of coal from Optimum Coal Mine (OCM); former CEO Brian Molefe’s resignation; the suspension of the four executives; his relationship with the Gupta family; and corporate governance during ...
Public Enterprises
Eskom Inquiry: G9 Consulting Services
27 Feb 2018
Document awaited: Opening statement by Rajie Murugan – G9 Group [please email [email protected] if you have the document
G9 Consulting Services appeared at the Inquiry and spoke on the findings and recommendations of its investigation at Eskom. The G9 investigation dealt with Eskom payments made to McKinsey and Trillian, which ...
Public Enterprises
Eskom Inquiry: Exxaro
14 Feb 2018
The Committee heard evidence from the Exxaro CEO about its relationship with Eskom; cost plus mines versus commercial mines; and prejudice to Exxaro cost plus mines by Eskom.
The Exxaro CEO categorically denied Eskom making prepayments to any mines, and certainly not cost plus mines as had been stated by ...
Public Enterprises
Eskom Inquiry: Ben Martins
31 Jan 2018
Deputy Minister for Public Enterprises, Mr Ben Martins, in his testimony, disputed Eskom’s suspended head of legal Ms Suzanne Daniels’s claim that the two had a meeting with Mr Duduzane Zuma, Mr Salim Essa and Mr Ajay Gupta at Melrose Arch on July 29, 2017. Mr Martins said that on ...
Public Enterprises
Eskom Inquiry: Lucky Montana
30 Jan 2018
The Eskom Inquiry heard a submission from Mr Lucky Montana, former CEO of State-Owned Enterprise (SOE), Prasa. Mr Montana stated that he had been called to give evidence at the inquiry following the media briefing that Deputy Minister of Public Enterprises and former Minister of Transport, Ben Martins, convened in ...
Public Enterprises
State-Owned Companies’ governance challenges: Minister’s progress report
30 Jan 2018
The Portfolio Committee on Public Enterprises met with the Minister of Public Enterprises and the leadership of state-owned companies (SOCs) to discuss the progress made in addressing the governance challenges they were encountering.
The Minister of Public Enterprises had a direct and stern message for the boards of SOCs -- ...
Public Enterprises
Eskom inquiry: Matshela Koko
24 Jan 2018
Mr Matshela Koko, Eskom Group Executive: Generation at Eskom and former Acting CEO, has worked for Eskom for 23 years although he has been on suspension a number of times and came close to being fired in 2011. He was put on special leave in May 2017 and later suspended ...
Public Enterprises
Eskom Inquiry: Anoj Singh
23 Jan 2018
Documents handed out: Mr Matshela Koko letter to DMR Director General about a cash injection for Tegeta; Eskom Assurance and Forensic memo on McKinsey & Company’s Top Engineering programme 6/11/2015; Dale Siekart email to Laher, Mokatle, Govender and Tsholanku; Internal Audit report 611/2015; Eskom Legal and Compliance memo 22/08/17 [Documents were not provided]
Mr Anoj Singh, ...
Public Enterprises
Eskom Inquiry: Zethembe Khoza (continued)
6 Dec 2017
Before the Acting Eskom board chairperson, Mr Zethembe Khoza, gave evidence, the Committee said that Deputy Minister Ben Martins should be issued a subpoena after he wrote declining to appear before the Eskom Inquiry despite initially requesting to appear before the Committee. He provided a written statement instead.
Members noted ...
Public Enterprises
Eskom Inquiry: Anton Minaar & postponement of Anoj Singh
5 Dec 2017
The Chairperson announced that the Eskom Board and Mr Anoj Singh would appear before the Committee. However, before the Committee engaged with the Board, they would hear from Mr Minnaar, Executive Support Manager at Eskom, who had to be questioned before the Committee listened to the Board, on the narrow ...