Member of the Gauteng Provincial Legislature
Democratic Alliance (DA)
Not associated with any constituency offices
083 899 2127
[email protected]
[email protected]
[email protected]
Member at Infrastructure Development Committee-gau (Gauteng Provincial Legislature Committee)
since 26th July 2024
Alternate Member at Co-Operative Governance & Traditional Affairs (Gauteng Provincial Legislature Committee)
since 26th July 2024
Member at Programming Committee-gau (Gauteng Provincial Legislature Committee)
since 26th July 2024
Alternate Member at Petitions Committee-Gau (Gauteng Provincial Legislature Committee)
since 26th July 2024
Member at Gauteng Provincial Legislature (Provincial-Legislature)
since 14th June 2024
Member at Democratic Alliance (DA) (Party)
from 24th October 2022 until 28th May 2024
Alternate Member at Community Safety Portfolio Committee (Gauteng Provincial Legislature Committee)
from 22nd August 2022 until 28th May 2024
Member at Programming Committee-gau (Gauteng Provincial Legislature Committee)
from 18th February 2022 until 28th May 2024
Alternate Member at Rules Committee-Gau (Gauteng Provincial Legislature Committee)
from 18th February 2022 until 28th May 2024
Member at Infrastructure Development Committee-gau (Gauteng Provincial Legislature Committee)
from 18th February 2021 until 28th May 2024
Alternate Member at Social Transformation Cluster Community Safety Portfolio Committee-gau (Gauteng Provincial Legislature Committee)
from 18th February 2021 until 28th May 2024
Member at Gauteng Provincial Legislature (Provincial-Legislature)
from 18th February 2021 until 28th May 2024
Alternate Member at Social Development Portfolio Committee (Gauteng Provincial Legislature Committee)
from 18th February 2021 until 28th May 2024
41st Candidate at Democratic Alliance Provincial Gauteng Election List 2014 (Election List)
from 22nd April 2014 until 7th May 2014
183rd Candidate at Democratic Alliance National Election List 2014 (Election List)
from 22nd April 2014 until 7th May 2014