Hon members, I wish to announce that the following members who could not be sworn in on 21 May 2014 were sworn in by judges designated by the Chief Justice: Mr Z S Makhubele, Ms H Mkhize and Ms N Ntwanambi.
The vacancy which occurred due to Mr T T Mboweni not taking up his seat has been filled by the nomination of Ms M P Mmola with effect from 7 May 2014. The vacancy which occurred in the National Assembly owing to the hon President ceasing to be a member in terms of section 87 of the Constitution has been filled by the nomination of Mr L Ramatlakane with effect from 22 May 2014. The vacancies which occurred owing to the resignations of Mr N G Kodwa and Mr M C J van Schalkwyk have been filled with effect from 26 May 2014 by the nominations of Ms P E Adams and Mr T Z M Khoza respectively. Lastly, the vacancies which occurred owing to the resignations of Mr J S Ndebele, Mr M V Sisulu, Ms B M Ntuli and Ms L M Xingwana have been filled with effect from 30 May 2014 by the nominations of Mr L K B Mpumlwana, Ms T M A Tongwane, Ms J D Kilian and Mr C Nqakula respectively.
The members made and subscribed the oath or solemn affirmation in the Speaker's office.